|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 580, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6365.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4752.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5046.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27).
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. Measure version as amended on March 19 corrected.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|