LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1723
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1723
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1723
Compare Versions
AB1723 Chaptered September 26, 2012
AB1723 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1723 Amended August 22, 2012
AB1723 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1723 Amended June 27, 2012
AB1723 Amended May 1, 2012
AB1723 Amended April 24, 2012
AB1723 Amended April 10, 2012
AB1723 Amended March 19, 2012
AB1723 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1723 Chaptered September 26, 2012
AB1723 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1723 Amended August 22, 2012
AB1723 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1723 Amended June 27, 2012
AB1723 Amended May 1, 2012
AB1723 Amended April 24, 2012
AB1723 Amended April 10, 2012
AB1723 Amended March 19, 2012
AB1723 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare