California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1723 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012
Bill March 19, 2012