BILL NUMBER: AB 1723AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 27, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 1, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 24, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 10, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fuentes ( Coauthor: Senator Lieu ) FEBRUARY 16, 2012 An act to amend Section 66020.5 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1723, as amended, Fuentes. Postsecondary educational institutions: meetings: live video and audio transmission. Existing law requires the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, the Trustees of the California State University, the California Postsecondary Education Commission, and the Student Aid Commission, including a specified auxiliary organization, and requests the Regents of the University of California, to provide for live audio transmission of all meetings, which are open to the public pursuant to specified law, through a technology that is accessible to as large a segment of the public as possible, including, but not necessarily limited to, the use of cable, satellite, over-the-air, or any other type of transmission that can be accessed though a television. This bill would require those entities, and request the regents, also to provide for live video transmissions and to archive and post the video and audio transmissions on the entity's Internet Web site for at least 12 months and within 48 hours following the initial transmission. The bill would remove over-the-air transmissions from the list of transmissions that can be accessed through a television, and would exempt the Student Aid Commission, including a specified auxiliary organization, from the requirement to provide for live video transmissions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66020.5 of the Education Code is amended to read: 66020.5. (a)Except as provided for in subdivision (c), theThe Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, the Trustees of the California State University, the California Postsecondary Education Commission, and the Student Aid Commission, including any auxiliary organization established pursuant to Section 69522, shall, and the Regents of the University of California are requested to, do both of the following: (1) Provide for live video and audio transmission of all meetings, which are open to the public pursuant to the Bagley-Keene Open Meeting Act (Article 9 (commencing with Section 11120) of Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code), through a technology that is accessible to as large a segment of the public as possible, including, but not necessarily limited to, the use of either of the following technologies: (A) Cable, satellite, or any other type of transmission that can be accessed through a television. (B) Web cast, in which case notice of meetings that are open to the public and links to the Web cast shall be easily accessible via each entity's Internet Web site. (2) Archive and post the video and audio transmissions recorded pursuant to paragraph (1) on the entity's Internet Web site for at least 12 months and within 48 hours following the initial transmission. (b) It is not a violation of this section if technical failures prevent an entity from providing a live video or audio transmission , or archiving or posting the video and audio transmission , so long as the entity exercised reasonable diligence in making a live video or audio transmission available and archiving and posting the video and audio transmission.(c) The Student Aid Commission, including any auxiliary organization established pursuant to Section 69522, shall be exempt from the requirement in subdivision (a) to provide for live video transmissions.