California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1723 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/26/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1723CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 580 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 26, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 27, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 27, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 1, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 24, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 10, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fuentes (Coauthor: Senator Lieu) FEBRUARY 16, 2012 An act to amend Section 66020.5 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1723, Fuentes. Postsecondary educational institutions: meetings: live video and audio transmission. Existing law requires the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, the Trustees of the California State University, the California Postsecondary Education Commission, and the Student Aid Commission, including a specified auxiliary organization, and requests the Regents of the University of California, to provide for live audio transmission of all meetings, which are open to the public pursuant to specified law, through a technology that is accessible to as large a segment of the public as possible, including, but not necessarily limited to, the use of cable, satellite, over-the-air, or any other type of transmission that can be accessed though a television. This bill would require those entities, other than the California Postsecondary Education Commission, which would be deleted from this provision, and request the regents, also to provide for live video transmissions, as specified, and to archive and post the video and audio transmissions on the entity's Internet Web site for at least 12 months and within 48 hours following the initial transmission. The bill would remove over-the-air transmissions from the list of transmissions that can be accessed through a television. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66020.5 of the Education Code is amended to read: 66020.5. (a) The Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, the Trustees of the California State University, and the Student Aid Commission, including any auxiliary organization established pursuant to Section 69522, shall, and the Regents of the University of California are requested to, do all of the following: (1) (A) Provide for live video and audio transmission of all meetings, which are open to the public pursuant to the Bagley-Keene Open Meeting Act (Article 9 (commencing with Section 11120) of Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code), through a technology that is accessible to as large a segment of the public as possible, including, but not necessarily limited to, the use of either of the following technologies: (i) Cable, satellite, or any other type of transmission that can be accessed through a television. (ii) Web cast, in which case notice of meetings that are open to the public and links to the Web cast shall be easily accessible via each entity's Internet Web site. (B) If the meeting described in subparagraph (A) is conducted from more than one location at the same time, through a teleconference or a similar technology, the live video transmission shall be provided from at least one of the locations and the live audio transmission shall be provided from all locations. (2) Provide public notice before the meeting regarding which location or locations the live video transmission will be provided from pursuant to paragraph (1). (3) Archive and post the video and audio transmissions recorded pursuant to paragraph (1) on the entity's Internet Web site for at least 12 months and within 48 hours following the initial transmission. (b) It is not a violation of this section if technical failures prevent an entity from providing a live video or audio transmission, or archiving or posting the video and audio transmission, so long as the entity exercised reasonable diligence in making a live video or audio transmission available and archiving and posting the video and audio transmission.