|
09/29/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 356, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2964.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2975.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 6).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2190.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1125.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1040.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|