LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB220
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB220
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB220
Compare Versions
AB220 Chaptered September 29, 2011
AB220 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB220 Amended July 13, 2011
AB220 Amended June 29, 2011
AB220 Amended June 16, 2011
AB220 Amended June 1, 2011
AB220 Amended April 25, 2011
AB220 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB220 Chaptered September 29, 2011
AB220 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB220 Amended July 13, 2011
AB220 Amended June 29, 2011
AB220 Amended June 16, 2011
AB220 Amended June 1, 2011
AB220 Amended April 25, 2011
AB220 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare