California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB220 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/29/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 220CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 356 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 31, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 7, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 13, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 29, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Solorio FEBRUARY 1, 2011 An act to amend Section 1403 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 220, Solorio. Interstate Compact for Juveniles. The Interstate Compact for Juveniles, among other things, provides for the establishment of rules and procedures for the tracking and supervision or return of juveniles and juvenile offenders among compacting states. Existing law makes the Interstate Compact for Juveniles operative in this state, and designates the executive director of the Correction Standards Authority as the compact administrator, until January 1, 2012. This bill would extend the operation of those provisions in this state until January 1, 2014. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1403 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: 1403. This chapter shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2014, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2014, deletes or extends that date.