California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB220 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2011

Amended

Bill July 13, 2011
Bill June 29, 2011
Bill June 16, 2011
Bill June 1, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011