|
09/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 337, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 4. Page 6233.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4642.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 22. Page 3601.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3560.)
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (January 11).
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|