California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill May 23, 2012
Bill January 23, 2012
Bill January 9, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill April 25, 2011