BILL NUMBER: AB 317CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 337 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 17, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 17, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 21, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 16, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 7, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 9, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Charles Calderon FEBRUARY 9, 2011 An act to amend Section 798.74.5 of the Civil Code, relating to mobilehomes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 317, Charles Calderon. Mobilehomes. Existing law, the Mobilehome Residency Law, governs tenancies in mobilehome parks, and imposes various duties on the owners of mobilehome parks and the agents and representatives authorized to act on behalf of the owners. Existing law exempts a rental agreement from any local ordinance, rule, regulation, or initiative that establishes a maximum amount that a landlord may charge a tenant for rent if a mobilehome space within a mobilehome park is not the principal residence, as defined, of the mobilehome owner. Existing law requires the management of a mobilehome park to give a prospective homeowner a document containing specified information within 2 business days of receiving a request from the prospective homeowner for an application for residency in the mobilehome park if the management has been advised that the mobilehome occupying the requested space is for sale. Under existing law, the management must also provide a copy of the rules and regulations of the park at the prospective homeowner's request. The bill would revise the above-described document to include language advising prospective homeowners that if they do not occupy the mobilehome as their principal residence, those homeowners may be no longer subject to any local ordinances, rules, regulations, or initiative measures limiting or restricting rent in mobilehome parks. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 798.74.5 of the Civil Code is amended to read: 798.74.5. (a) Within two business days of receiving a request from a prospective homeowner for an application for residency for a specific space within a mobilehome park, if the management has been advised that the mobilehome occupying that space is for sale, the management shall give the prospective homeowner a separate document in at least 12-point type entitled "INFORMATION FOR PROSPECTIVE HOMEOWNERS," which includes the following statements: "As a prospective homeowner you are being provided with certain information you should know prior to applying for tenancy in a mobilehome park. This is not meant to be a complete list of information. Owning a home in a mobilehome park incorporates the dual role of "homeowner" (the owner of the home) and park resident or tenant (also called a "homeowner" in the Mobilehome Residency Law). As a homeowner under the Mobilehome Residency Law, you will be responsible for paying the amount necessary to rent the space for your home, in addition to other fees and charges described below. You must also follow certain rules and regulations to reside in the park. If you are approved for tenancy, and your tenancy commences within the next 30 days, your beginning monthly rent will be $____ (must be completed by the management) for space number ____ (must be completed by the management). Additional information regarding future rent or fee increases may also be provided. In addition to the monthly rent, you will be obligated to pay to the park the following additional fees and charges listed below. Other fees or charges may apply depending upon your specific requests. Metered utility charges are based on use. _________________________________________________ _________________________________________________ (Management shall describe the fee or charge and a good faith estimate of each fee or charge.) Some spaces are governed by an ordinance, rule, regulation, or initiative measure that limits or restricts rents in mobilehome parks. These laws are commonly known as "rent control." Prospective purchasers who do not occupy the mobilehome as their principal residence may be subject to rent levels which are not governed by these laws. (Civil Code Section 798.21) Long-term leases specify rent increases during the term of the lease. By signing a rental agreement or lease for a term of more than one year, you may be removing your rental space from a local rent control ordinance during the term, or any extension, of the lease if a local rent control ordinance is in effect for the area in which the space is located. A fully executed lease or rental agreement, or a statement signed by the park's management and by you stating that you and the management have agreed to the terms and conditions of a rental agreement, is required to complete the sale or escrow process of the home. You have no rights to tenancy without a properly executed lease or agreement or that statement. (Civil Code Section 798.75) If the management collects a fee or charge from you in order to obtain a financial report or credit rating, the full amount of the fee or charge will be either credited toward your first month's rent or, if you are rejected for any reason, refunded to you. However, if you are approved by management, but, for whatever reason, you elect not to purchase the mobilehome, the management may retain the fee to defray its administrative costs. (Civil Code Section 798.74) We encourage you to request from management a copy of the lease or rental agreement, the park's rules and regulations, and a copy of the Mobilehome Residency Law. Upon request, park management will provide you a copy of each document. We urge you to read these documents before making the decision that you want to become a mobilehome park resident. Dated: _______________________ Signature of Park Manager: __________________ Acknowledge Receipt by Prospective Homeowner: ____________________________________'' (b) Management shall provide a prospective homeowner, upon his or her request, with a copy of the rules and regulations of the park and with a copy of this chapter.