LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB317
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB317
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB317
Compare Versions
AB317 Chaptered September 17, 2012
AB317 Enrolled August 29, 2012
AB317 Amended August 16, 2012
AB317 Amended August 7, 2012
AB317 Amended May 23, 2012
AB317 Amended January 23, 2012
AB317 Amended January 9, 2012
AB317 Amended January 4, 2012
AB317 Amended April 25, 2011
AB317 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB317 Chaptered September 17, 2012
AB317 Enrolled August 29, 2012
AB317 Amended August 16, 2012
AB317 Amended August 7, 2012
AB317 Amended May 23, 2012
AB317 Amended January 23, 2012
AB317 Amended January 9, 2012
AB317 Amended January 4, 2012
AB317 Amended April 25, 2011
AB317 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare