|
09/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4960.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Set for hearing August 28. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4913.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4854.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6180.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6051.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1172.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 852.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|