LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB415
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB415
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB415
Compare Versions
SB415 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB415 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB415 Amended August 21, 2012
SB415 Amended June 26, 2012
SB415 Amended June 18, 2012
SB415 Amended June 27, 2011
SB415 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB415 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB415 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB415 Amended August 21, 2012
SB415 Amended June 26, 2012
SB415 Amended June 18, 2012
SB415 Amended June 27, 2011
SB415 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare