California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB415 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012
Bill June 27, 2011