BILL NUMBER: SB 415CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 353 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 17, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 17, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 29, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 18, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 27, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Senator Price FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act to add Section 73.01 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 415, Price. State highways: relinquishment. Existing law gives the Department of Transportation full possession and control of all state highways. Existing law describes the authorized routes in the state highway system and establishes a process for adoption of a highway on an authorized route by the California Transportation Commission. Existing law also provides for the relinquishment of state highways or portions of state highways to any county or city by the commission in accordance with specified criteria and procedures. This bill would, in addition, authorize the commission to relinquish to a county transportation commission or regional transportation planning agency a park-and-ride lot within their respective jurisdictions, if the department enters into an agreement with the county transportation commission or regional transportation planning agency providing for that relinquishment. The relinquishment would be upon terms and conditions that the commission finds to be in the best interests of the state, but the bill would require the maintenance of a specified number of parking spaces. The relinquishment would be effective on the date following the county recorder's recordation of the relinquishment resolution containing the commission's approval of terms and conditions of the relinquishment. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 73.01 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 73.01. The commission may relinquish to a county transportation commission created pursuant to Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 130000) of Division 12 of the Public Utilities Code, or regional transportation planning agency, a park-and-ride lot within their respective jurisdictions, on terms and conditions that the commission finds to be within the best interests of the state, if the department enters into an agreement with the county transportation commission or regional transportation planning agency providing for that relinquishment. The county transportation commission or regional transportation planning agency requesting the relinquishment shall agree to maintain, at a minimum, the number of parking spaces provided by the department in the lot at the time of relinquishment. Any such relinquishment shall become effective on the date following the county recorder's recordation of the relinquishment resolution containing the commission's approval of the terms and conditions of the relinquishment.