|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 3554.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2994.) (March 21).
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|