California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB952 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 06/11/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 952AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 11, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 8, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 16, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 28, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 14, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Alquist  (   Principal   coauthors:   Senators   Huff,   Lowenthal,  and Steinberg   )   (   Coauthors:   Senators   Anderson,   Blakeslee,   Corbett,   De Len,   DeSaulnier,   Evans,   and Fuller   )   (   Coauthor:  Assembly Member   Hill   )  JANUARY 5, 2012 An act to add and repeal Section 89517.5 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 952, as amended, Alquist. Public postsecondary education: employee compensation. Existing law establishes the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in the state. This bill would prohibit, from  July   August  1, 2012, to June 30, 2014, inclusive, the Trustees of the California State University from entering into, or renewing, a contract that provides for a compensation increase for a California State University employee whose annual salary exceeds $200,000 from General Fund sources, as defined, in the fiscal year during which the contract is executed, relative to the immediately prior contract for that same position. The bill would prohibit, on or after July 1, 2014, and until July 1, 2018, the trustees from entering into, or renewing, a contract that provides for a compensation increase of more than 10% for a California State University employee whose annual salary exceeds $200,000 from General Fund sources in the fiscal year during which the contract is executed, relative to the immediately prior contract for that position. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89517.5 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89517.5. (a) From  July   August  1, 2012, to June 30, 2014, inclusive, the Trustees of the California State University shall not enter into, or renew, a contract that provides for a compensation increase for a California State University employee whose annual salary exceeds two hundred thousand dollars ($200,000) from General Fund sources in the fiscal year during which the contract is executed, relative to the immediately prior contract for that same position. (b) On or after July 1, 2014, the trustees shall not enter into, or renew, a contract that provides for a compensation increase of more than 10 percent for a California State University employee whose annual salary exceeds two hundred thousand dollars ($200,000) from General Fund sources in the fiscal year during which the contract is executed, relative to the immediately prior contract for that position. (c) For purposes of this section, "General Fund sources" includes appropriations from the General Fund and student fee revenues. (d) This section shall become inoperative on July 1, 2018, and, as of January 1, 2019, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2019, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed. SEC. 2. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to respond to and alleviate the effects of the state's current fiscal crisis and the resulting additional budget cuts and tuition increases for the California State University, it is necessary for this act to take effect immediately.