California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB952 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2012

Amended

Bill June 11, 2012
Bill May 8, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill March 28, 2012
Bill March 14, 2012