LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB952
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB952
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB952
Compare Versions
SB952 Amended June 11, 2012
SB952 Amended May 8, 2012
SB952 Amended April 16, 2012
SB952 Amended March 28, 2012
SB952 Amended March 14, 2012
SB952 Introduced January 5, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB952 Amended June 11, 2012
SB952 Amended May 8, 2012
SB952 Amended April 16, 2012
SB952 Amended March 28, 2012
SB952 Amended March 14, 2012
SB952 Introduced January 5, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare