|
09/30/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2773.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1983.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1745.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) . Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|