BILL NUMBER: AB 549CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 422 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 30, 2013 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 30, 2013 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 26, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 30, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 11, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 24, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 1, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 14, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Jones-Sawyer FEBRUARY 20, 2013 An act to add Section 32282.1 to the Education Code, relating to school safety. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 549, Jones-Sawyer. Comprehensive school safety plans: mental health professionals and police role on campus guidelines. Existing law provides that school districts and county offices of education are responsible for the overall development of a comprehensive school safety plan for its schools operating kindergarten or any of grades 1 to 12, inclusive. Existing law requires the schoolsite council of a school to write and develop the comprehensive school safety plan relevant to the needs and resources of the particular school, except as specified with regard to a small school district. Existing law requires the comprehensive school safety plan to include specified strategies and programs that will provide or maintain a high level of school safety. Existing law encourages, as comprehensive school safety plans are reviewed and updated, all plans to include policies and procedures aimed at the prevention of bullying. This bill would also encourage that comprehensive school safety plans, as they are reviewed and updated, include clear guidelines, for the roles and responsibilities of certain parties with school-related health and safety responsibilities and would authorize the inclusion in these plans of primary strategies for specified purposes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 32282.1 is added to the Education Code, to read: 32282.1. As comprehensive school safety plans are reviewed and updated, the Legislature encourages all plans, to the extent that resources are available, to include clear guidelines for the roles and responsibilities of mental health professionals, community intervention professionals, school counselors, school resource officers, and police officers on school campus, if the school district uses these people. The guidelines may include primary strategies to create and maintain a positive school climate, promote school safety, and increase pupil achievement, and prioritize mental health and intervention services, restorative and transformative justice programs, and positive behavior interventions and support.