LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB549
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB549
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB549
Compare Versions
AB549 Chaptered September 30, 2013
AB549 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB549 Amended August 15, 2013
AB549 Amended July 11, 2013
AB549 Amended May 24, 2013
AB549 Amended May 6, 2013
AB549 Amended April 23, 2013
AB549 Amended April 1, 2013
AB549 Amended March 14, 2013
AB549 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB549 Chaptered September 30, 2013
AB549 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB549 Amended August 15, 2013
AB549 Amended July 11, 2013
AB549 Amended May 24, 2013
AB549 Amended May 6, 2013
AB549 Amended April 23, 2013
AB549 Amended April 1, 2013
AB549 Amended March 14, 2013
AB549 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare