California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB549 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2013

Amended

Bill August 15, 2013
Bill July 11, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 6, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013
Bill March 14, 2013