Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4758.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6294.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2873.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2014
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|