California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR79 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/28/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 79CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 129 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 28, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 22, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 21, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 19, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 10, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 3, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Galgiani FEBRUARY 3, 2014 Relative to school and college textbooks. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 79, Galgiani. School and college textbooks: recycled paper. This measure would urge the Superintendent of Public Instruction, the President of the University of California, the Chancellor of the California State University, and the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges to ensure that all persons in their respective jurisdictions responsible for the procurement of school or college textbooks are aware of the benefits of recycled paper and that those persons consider those benefits when purchasing textbooks for use in their respective institutions. WHEREAS, The publication of the hundreds of thousands of school and college textbooks annually used in California are made from paper, a resource that is renewable, recyclable, and available in a high percentage of recycled content form for school and college textbooks; and WHEREAS, In 2012, 65.1 percent of paper consumed in the United States was recovered for recycling, contributing towards California's goal of achieving 75-percent collection for recycling. A greater effort should now be made to use that recovered paper in new, recycled products such as textbook paper with a high percentage of recycled content; and WHEREAS, New milling techniques can produce paper with over 80 percent recycled content that meets rigorous national standards for the quality and durability of textbooks; and WHEREAS, High standards of textbook quality can be met through the use of recycled paper; and WHEREAS, It is in the interest of the public and the environment to maximize the use of paper with a high percentage of recycled content; and WHEREAS, Many school district and college employees who are responsible for purchasing textbooks are aware of their options with respect to using instructional materials that contain recycled paper, but it would serve the public interest if there were greater awareness of the benefits of the use of school and college textbooks published with recycled paper; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature urges the Superintendent of Public Instruction, the President of the University of California, the Chancellor of the California State University, and the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges to ensure that all persons in their respective jurisdictions responsible for the procurement of school or college textbooks are aware of the benefits of recycled paper and that those persons consider those benefits when purchasing textbooks for use in their respective institutions; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Superintendent of Public Instruction, the President of the University of California, the Chancellor of the California State University, and the Chancellor of the California Community Colleges, and to the author for appropriate distribution.