California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR79 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2014

Amended

Bill June 19, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014
Bill March 3, 2014