LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR79
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR79
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR79
Compare Versions
SCR79 Chaptered August 28, 2014
SCR79 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SCR79 Amended June 19, 2014
SCR79 Amended April 10, 2014
SCR79 Amended March 3, 2014
SCR79 Introduced February 3, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SCR79 Chaptered August 28, 2014
SCR79 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SCR79 Amended June 19, 2014
SCR79 Amended April 10, 2014
SCR79 Amended March 3, 2014
SCR79 Introduced February 3, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare