|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5428.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5917.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4038.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3999.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3200.) (March 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Set for hearing March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|