LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB911
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB911
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB911
Compare Versions
SB911 Chaptered September 22, 2016
SB911 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB911 Amended August 15, 2016
SB911 Amended June 30, 2016
SB911 Amended June 16, 2016
SB911 Amended March 17, 2016
SB911 Introduced January 26, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB911 Chaptered September 22, 2016
SB911 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB911 Amended August 15, 2016
SB911 Amended June 30, 2016
SB911 Amended June 16, 2016
SB911 Amended March 17, 2016
SB911 Introduced January 26, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare