BILL NUMBER: SB 911CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 490 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 22, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 22, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 25, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 15, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 16, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hertzberg (Coauthors: Senators Block, Glazer, and McGuire) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bigelow, Cristina Garcia, Gonzalez, and Waldron) JANUARY 26, 2016 An act to amend Section 33384 of, and to repeal Section 33385 of, the Education Code, relating to American Indian education programs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 911, Hertzberg. California American Indian education centers. Existing law, to be repealed on January 1, 2017, provides for the establishment of California American Indian education centers by any tribal group or incorporated American Indian association to meet specified objectives, and further provides for the administration of grants, upon application, by the State Department of Education for those purposes in accordance with specified provisions. Existing law requires each center to annually submit specified data to the department that reflects each center's ability to meet its stated objectives, and requires the department, on or before January 1, 2011, and again on or before January 1, 2016, to report consolidated results for all California American Indian education centers, provide information required to evaluate the results, and make recommendations for program improvement. This bill would instead require each center to submit data that reflects the center's progress toward meeting its stated objectives and any other objectives chosen by the center. The bill would require the department to report the information on or before January 1, 2021, and every 5 years thereafter, and would specify that the information shall be reported to the appropriate fiscal and policy committees of the Legislature. The bill would also delete the January 1, 2017, repeal date. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 33384 of the Education Code is amended to read: 33384. (a) (1) Each center shall annually submit a report to the department that includes appropriate data, presented in a format developed jointly with the department, that reflects each center's progress toward meeting its stated objectives, including pupil academic performance, meeting the continued educational and cultural needs of the community that the center serves, and any other objectives chosen by the center. (2) On or before January 1, 2021, and every five years thereafter, the department shall report all of the following information to the appropriate fiscal and policy committees of the Legislature: (A) Consolidated results for all centers, consistent with federal law regarding the privacy of pupil information. (B) Information required to evaluate the consolidated results. (C) Recommendations for program improvement. (b) The centers shall maintain sound fiscal policies. The department shall provide technical assistance and training to the centers in order to assist the centers to maintain sound fiscal policies. The department may require an annual program audit. However, if the department deems it fiscally unsound for the centers to provide an annual audit, a fiscal review shall suffice. (c) The department shall provide technical assistance and professional development to the directors of the California American Indian education centers throughout the year that shall include timely documented responses and professional guidance meant to improve center programs. SEC. 2. Section 33385 of the Education Code is repealed.