California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB911 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016