Senate | 03/10/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3186.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3817.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 29). | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2994.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |