LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR95
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR95
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR95
Compare Versions
SCR95 Chaptered March 10, 2016
SCR95 Enrolled March 8, 2016
SCR95 Amended February 23, 2016
SCR95 Amended January 27, 2016
SCR95 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SCR95 Chaptered March 10, 2016
SCR95 Enrolled March 8, 2016
SCR95 Amended February 23, 2016
SCR95 Amended January 27, 2016
SCR95 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare