California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR95 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2016

Chaptered

Bill March 10, 2016

Amended

Bill February 23, 2016
Bill January 27, 2016