BILL NUMBER: SCR 95CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 10 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 10, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE MARCH 7, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 3, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 23, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 27, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Pan (Principal coauthor: Senator Huff) (Coauthors: Senators Allen, Anderson, Bates, Berryhill, Block, Cannella, Hall, Leno, Liu, Mitchell, Nguyen, Nielsen, Wieckowski, and Wolk) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Travis Allen, Baker, Brough, Chang, Chvez, Hadley, Kim, Maienschein, and Mark Stone) JANUARY 7, 2016 Relative to the Lunar New Year Celebration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 95, Pan. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration. WHEREAS, February 8, 2016, marks the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including the United States, and especially California; and WHEREAS, California is home to nearly 6 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; and WHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; and WHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by over 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; and WHEREAS, This Lunar New Year is the Year of the Fire Monkey and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties, and to start the new year with a clean slate; and WHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the state's rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating February 8, 2016, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year, the Year of the Fire Monkey, and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the authors for appropriate distribution.