California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill July 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill July 31, 2019

Amended

Bill April 25, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019