|
09/15/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 321, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2022
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4984.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2040.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|