California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1565 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Bill No. 1565 CHAPTER 321 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services. [ Approved by Governor September 15, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State September 15, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.
1+Enrolled September 01, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 23, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2022 Amended IN Senate August 11, 2022 Amended IN Assembly June 09, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1565Introduced by Committee on Emergency ManagementMarch 03, 2021 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.
22
3- Assembly Bill No. 1565 CHAPTER 321 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services. [ Approved by Governor September 15, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State September 15, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled September 01, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 23, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2022 Amended IN Senate August 11, 2022 Amended IN Assembly June 09, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1565Introduced by Committee on Emergency ManagementMarch 03, 2021 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
44
5- Assembly Bill No. 1565 CHAPTER 321
5+ Enrolled September 01, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 23, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2022 Amended IN Senate August 11, 2022 Amended IN Assembly June 09, 2021
66
7- Assembly Bill No. 1565
7+Enrolled September 01, 2022
8+Passed IN Senate August 23, 2022
9+Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2022
10+Amended IN Senate August 11, 2022
11+Amended IN Assembly June 09, 2021
812
9- CHAPTER 321
13+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION
14+
15+ Assembly Bill
16+
17+No. 1565
18+
19+Introduced by Committee on Emergency ManagementMarch 03, 2021
20+
21+Introduced by Committee on Emergency Management
22+March 03, 2021
1023
1124 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
12-
13- [ Approved by Governor September 15, 2022. Filed with Secretary of State September 15, 2022. ]
1425
1526 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1627
1728 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1829
1930 AB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.
2031
2132 Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.
2233
2334 Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.
2435
2536 This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.
2637
2738 ## Digest Key
2839
2940 ## Bill Text
3041
3142 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.
3243
3344 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3445
3546 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3647
3748 SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.
3849
3950 SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:
4051
4152 ### SECTION 1.
4253
4354 179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.
4455
4556 179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.
4657
4758 179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.
4859
4960
5061
5162 179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.