California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1565 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2022

Amended

Bill August 11, 2022
Bill June 9, 2021