California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1565 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/01/2022

                    Enrolled  September 01, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  August 11, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  June 09, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1565Introduced by Committee on Emergency ManagementMarch 03, 2021 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.

 Enrolled  September 01, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  August 11, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  June 09, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1565Introduced by Committee on Emergency ManagementMarch 03, 2021 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 01, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2022 Amended IN  Senate  August 11, 2022 Amended IN  Assembly  June 09, 2021

Enrolled  September 01, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  August 23, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  August 30, 2022
Amended IN  Senate  August 11, 2022
Amended IN  Assembly  June 09, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 1565

Introduced by Committee on Emergency ManagementMarch 03, 2021

Introduced by Committee on Emergency Management
March 03, 2021

 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.

Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.

Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.

This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.

SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.

179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.

179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.



179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.