California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1565 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/15/2022

                            Assembly Bill No. 1565 CHAPTER 321 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services. [ Approved by  Governor  September 15, 2022.  Filed with  Secretary of State  September 15, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.

 Assembly Bill No. 1565 CHAPTER 321 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services. [ Approved by  Governor  September 15, 2022.  Filed with  Secretary of State  September 15, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Assembly Bill No. 1565 CHAPTER 321

 Assembly Bill No. 1565

 CHAPTER 321

 An act to amend Section 179.9 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.

 [ Approved by  Governor  September 15, 2022.  Filed with  Secretary of State  September 15, 2022. ] 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1565, Committee on Emergency Management. Emergency Management Assistance Compact.

Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.

Existing law ratifies, approves, and sets forth the provisions of the Emergency Management Assistance Compact, an interstate agreement that provides for mutual assistance between states responding to emergencies and disasters. The compact becomes inoperative on March 1, 2023, and, as of January 1, 2024, is repealed.

This bill instead would make the compact inoperative on March 1, 2028, and repeal it on January 1, 2029.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.

SECTION 1. Section 179.9 of the Government Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.

179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.

179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.



179.9. This article shall become inoperative on March 1, 2028, and, as of January 1, 2029, is repealed.