04/12/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
04/04/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/01/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/01/2022 - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2022 - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |