Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1022 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 1, 2022
Fiscal Note January 17, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 30, 2022

Amended

Bill March 23, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022