Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 8, 2022
Fiscal Note May 6, 2022
Fiscal Note March 9, 2022
Bill February 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022