Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 15, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 5, 2022