Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1283 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 22, 2024
Fiscal Note February 22, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024

Amended

Bill May 3, 2024
Bill May 2, 2024