House | 04/08/2021 | File Number 328 | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | House Calendar Number 244 | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/14/2021 | Vote to Draft |