Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 8, 2021
Fiscal Note June 4, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Bill January 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021
Bill February 3, 2021